Period | Manager | Country | born |
01/07/2008 - 30/06/2010 | Pierfrancesco Battistini | 24/01/1971 | |
01/07/1981 - 30/06/1982 | Lorenzo Vellutini | 02/12/1922 | |
01/07/1978 - 30/06/1980 | Silvano Grassi | 16/09/1919 | |
01/07/1957 - 30/06/1958 | Zeffiro Furiassi | 19/01/1923 | |
01/07/1956 - 30/06/1957 | Mario Pagotto | 14/12/1911 |