Period | Manager | Country | born |
26/07/2024 - 30/06/2025 | Marko Maksimović | 20/08/1984 | |
24/07/2023 - 25/07/2024 | Zlatan Nalić | 23/01/1969 | |
22/03/2023 - 30/06/2023 | Danijel Pranjić | 02/12/1981 | |
19/03/2023 - 22/03/2023 | Adnan Osmanhodžić | 24/05/1971 | |
24/03/2022 - 30/06/2022 | Amir Spahic | 07/08/1981 | |
16/03/2021 - 24/03/2022 | Mladen Žižović | 27/12/1980 | |
10/03/2021 - 15/03/2023 | Adnan Jahić | 28/02/1985 | |
18/12/2019 - 09/03/2021 | Gradimir Crnogorac | 14/11/1982 | |
18/10/2019 - 13/12/2019 | Milenko Bošnjaković | 04/03/1968 | |
18/06/2019 - 29/09/2019 | Mile Lazarevic | 16/08/1960 | |
31/07/2018 - 03/06/2019 | Zlatan Nalić | 23/01/1969 | |
01/07/2018 - 30/07/2018 | Milenko Bošnjaković | 04/03/1968 | |
11/09/2017 - 30/06/2018 | Slavko Petrović | 10/08/1958 | |
11/10/2016 - 10/09/2017 | Vlado Jagodić | 22/03/1964 | |
12/09/2016 - 10/10/2016 | Amir Spahic | 07/08/1981 | |
16/01/2015 - 11/09/2016 | Husref Musemić | 04/07/1961 | |
01/07/2014 - 15/01/2015 | Denis Sadiković | 28/08/1967 | |
21/01/2014 - 30/06/2014 | Miroslav Blažević | 10/02/1935 | |
03/05/2012 - 18/09/2012 | Abdulah Ibraković | 22/07/1970 | |
28/09/2011 - 30/06/2012 | Darko Vojvodić | 08/05/1973 | |
05/01/2010 - 30/06/2011 | Vlatko Glavaš | 02/09/1962 | |
09/04/2003 - 30/06/2005 | Sakib Malkočević | 25/01/1965 | |
01/07/1976 - 31/12/1977 | Đorđe Gerum | ||
01/07/1970 - 30/06/1976 | Josip Duvančić | 01/10/1935 |