Period | Manager | Country | born |
01/07/2024 - 30/06/2025 | Raffaele Cardiello | 14/10/1993 | |
01/07/2023 - 30/06/2024 | Porimet Lötscher | 28/10/1990 | |
22/03/2023 - 30/06/2023 | Jacob Wolf | 24/03/1989 | |
01/07/2022 - 21/03/2023 | Sascha Müller | 28/02/1970 | |
01/07/2020 - 30/06/2022 | Ervin Gashi | 27/08/1990 | |
01/07/2017 - 30/06/2020 | Sascha Müller | 28/02/1970 | |
01/07/2009 - 30/06/2013 | Sascha Müller | 28/02/1970 | |
18/10/2008 - 30/06/2009 | René Weiler | 13/09/1973 |