Period | Manager | Country | born |
24/08/2018 - 31/12/2019 | Vladimir Nevinski | 14/09/1973 | |
18/06/2018 - 23/08/2018 | Leonid Lagun | 22/06/1978 | |
01/01/2018 - 17/06/2018 | Sergei Kabelski | 17/04/1973 | |
01/01/2014 - 15/03/2016 | Nikolay Branfilov | 16/12/1977 | |
01/01/1997 - 31/12/2001 | Anatoliy Yurevich | 12/08/1957 |