Period | Manager | Country | born |
09/01/2022 - 30/06/2024 | Steve Evans | 26/02/1979 | |
01/07/2013 - 15/01/2015 | Frank Sinclair | 03/12/1971 | |
01/07/2007 - 30/06/2008 | Gary Finley | 14/11/1970 | |
01/07/2006 - 31/12/2006 | Peter Davenport | 24/03/1961 |
Period | Manager | Country | born |
09/01/2022 - 30/06/2024 | Steve Evans | 26/02/1979 | |
01/07/2013 - 15/01/2015 | Frank Sinclair | 03/12/1971 | |
01/07/2007 - 30/06/2008 | Gary Finley | 14/11/1970 | |
01/07/2006 - 31/12/2006 | Peter Davenport | 24/03/1961 |