Squad | Appearances | ||
sorting |
Goalkeeper | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pascal Kalemba | Mangasport Moanda | 26/02/1979 | ||||
Defender | ||||||
Dikilu Bageta | TP Mazembe | 04/03/1978 | ||||
Gladys Bokese | Metalist Kharkiv | 10/09/1981 | ||||
Hérita Ilunga | AS Saint-Étienne | 25/02/1982 | ||||
Tshamalenga Kabundi | FC St. Eloi Lupopo | 15/05/1980 | ||||
Makiadi Kamata | ||||||
Christian Kinkela | Amiens SC | 25/05/1982 | ||||
Nono Lubanzadio | SC Cilu | 27/01/1980 | ||||
Dituabanza Nsumbu | AS Vita Club | 31/01/1982 | ||||
Midfielder | ||||||
Ngandu Kasongo | TP Mazembe | 06/12/1979 | ||||
Zola Matumona | FC Brussels | 26/11/1981 | ||||
Forward | ||||||
Dioko Kaluyituka | AS Vita Club | 02/01/1987 | ||||
Dieumerci Mbokani | RSC Anderlecht | 22/11/1985 | ||||
Manager | ||||||
Henri Depireux | since 01/07/2006 | 01/02/1944 | ||||
Claude Le Roy | since 01/07/2004 until 11/09/2006 | 06/02/1948 |