Period | Manager | Country | born |
01/07/2015 - 30/06/2025 | Alan Devonshire | 13/04/1956 | |
01/05/2003 - 30/11/2004 | John Dreyer | 11/06/1963 | |
01/07/1996 - 30/06/2003 | Alan Devonshire | 13/04/1956 | |
01/07/1964 - 30/06/1969 | Len Townsend | 31/08/1917 | |
01/07/1954 - 30/06/1958 | Len Townsend | 31/08/1917 |