Period | Manager | Country | born |
14/11/1995 - 30/06/1998 | Uwe Neuhaus | 26/11/1959 | |
01/07/1995 - 13/11/1995 | Peter Vollmann | 22/12/1957 | |
21/03/1995 - 30/06/1995 | Thomas Behlke | ||
01/07/1971 - 21/03/1995 | Franz-Josef Kneuper | 31/10/1952 |
Period | Manager | Country | born |
14/11/1995 - 30/06/1998 | Uwe Neuhaus | 26/11/1959 | |
01/07/1995 - 13/11/1995 | Peter Vollmann | 22/12/1957 | |
21/03/1995 - 30/06/1995 | Thomas Behlke | ||
01/07/1971 - 21/03/1995 | Franz-Josef Kneuper | 31/10/1952 |
Country: | Germany |
Founded: | 0000 |
stadium: | ---------- |
Homepage: | ---------- |
to the profile » |